AMAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to partners for, and develops, projects in the UK that provide high quality arts and culture programming that creates encounters between Muslims and the wider community, and/or develops new content to experience in person and online that represents and celebrates Muslim artists, stories, diversity and contributions to society. Convenes partners as a community. Shares impact learning
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 August 2020: CIO registration
- 02 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 02 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1100005 THE KHAYAAL THEATRE COMPANY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £615.89k | £327.88k | £39.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.15k | £460.60k | £251.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £615.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £190.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.63k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.98k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £65.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK BY SUPPORTING CREATIVE ENDEAVOURS IN THE ARTS, IN ALL ITS FORMS, AND CULTURE WHICH (A) INCREASE UNDERSTANDING OF BRITAIN’S MUSLIM COMMUNITIES AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE SECULAR OR OF OTHER FAITHS; AND (B) FOSTER A STRONGER SENSE OF BELONGING IN THE UK AMONG ITS MUSLIM COMMUNITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window