THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NORTH WEARSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anglican place of worship. The Churches are open to the general public. Holy Trinity Church, Southwick, Sunderland and St. Cuthbert Church, Red House, Sunderland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sunderland
Governance
- 19 August 2020: Standard registration
- NORTH WEARSIDE PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jennifer Bradshaw | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Lynne Colling | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Paula Maria Barber | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Beverley Mclean | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Laura Elizabeth Barber | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Brian Carmody | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Albert Parkin | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Lydia Jayne Armstrong | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Foster | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.04k | £107.20k | £84.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.94k | £165.79k | £91.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a Park Avenue
Sunderland
SR6 9PU
- Phone:
- +447443228077
- Website:
-
northwearsideparish.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window