NORTHERN ICE WHEELCHAIR CURLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement physical and mental health and self esteem. Disability. Amateur Sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Northumberland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 October 2020: Standard registration
- 13 December 2021: Funds received from 504098 NORTHERN CHALLENGE
- NIWCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART PIMBLETT | Chair | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
GARY LOGAN | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Mattison | Trustee | 28 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen McGarry | Trustee | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norma Woods | Trustee | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.25k | £10.63k | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.53k | £10.37k | £11.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, AND IN PARTICULAR WHEELCHAIR USERS IN THE NORTH OF ENGLAND, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WHEELCHAIR CURLING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Twickenham Court
Seghill
Cramlington
NE23 7TB
- Phone:
- 07843001366
- Email:
- northern-ice@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window