BIOCAP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop a regional map detailing where best within a regions countryside, to use nature based interventions to capture carbon and enhance biodiversity To identify and facilitate Tree planting, ecosystem restoration and conservation projects To engage with and educate local people and business in the use of carbon and biodiversity offsetting to mitigate climate change and biodiversity loss
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,025 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDMUND ASHLEY COOPER | Chair | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
William Pitt | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Bushell | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.27k | £20.35k | £31.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.94k | £17.23k | £39.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | £14.93k | £7.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY ENGAGING IN PROJECTS DESIGNED TO MITIGATE CLIMATE CHANGE AND ITS EFFECTSAND TO PROMOTE BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY BY FACILITATING PUBLIC ENGAGEMENT IN NATURE CONSERVATION AND PRACTICAL NATURE BASED WORK THAT CAN MITIGATE CLIMATE CHANGE AND BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY LOSS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF CLIMATE CHANGE, BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY LOSS AND THEIR MITIGATION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND BIOLOGICALDIVERSITY LOSS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27B PRIORY ROAD
NEWBURY
RG14 7QS
- Phone:
- 07899794794
- Email:
- ed.cooper@biocap.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window