CUTCHI SUNNI MUSLIM ASSOCIATION (BIRMINGHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association aims is to serve the Cutchi people of West Midlands who are a minority in the UK by providing them community services as encapsulated in the Objects below: The advancement of education (IT, English Language, Health and Dietary, Faith, etc) To encourage and develop social and sporting activities, which will encourage more people to get active and stay healthy. Organise Trips
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED AZEEM HUSSEIN SULEMAN | Chair | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sultan Mahmood | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shaida Jamil Mussani | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Suleman | Trustee | 20 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.30k | £144.15k | £220.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.74k | £154.80k | £212.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE MUSLIMS INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION AND IN PARTICULAR: (1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY; (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS; (4) TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMANY; AND (5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 BRAMLEY DRIVE
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2LP
- Phone:
- 07853208506
- Email:
- info@csmabirmingham.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window