PHILLAND PEOPLE'S ENDEAVOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funds to agents in Uganda and other places to support children with education and physical needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Uganda
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Charles Phillips | Chair | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Jane Phillips | Trustee | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Stephen Wieland | Trustee | 21 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/03/2021 | 20/03/2022 | 20/03/2023 | 20/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.93k | £11.19k | £9.31k | £17.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.92k | £11.13k | £14.99k | £17.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 20 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AND THEIR PARENTS AT ‘ST JAMES PARENTS’S SCHOOL, ENTEBBE, AND ANY OTHER SCHOOL IN UGANDA THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE UNDER 18 RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN‘THE KATANGA SLUM’ AND ANY OTHER AREA IN UGANDA THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG ORPHANS, PUPILS, ORGANISERS, PARENTS AND TEACHERS LIVING OR CONNECTED TO ‘THE KATANGA SLUM’, ‘ST JAMES PARENTS’S SCHOOL, ENTEBBE. AND ANY OTHER COMMUNITY FOCUSED ON THE EDUCATION OF UNDER 18S IN UGANDA THAT THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT. EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Lanhams Court
Davenants
Pitsea
BASILDON
Essex
SS13 1RX
- Phone:
- 01253752114
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window