Governing document CVW Community Volunteers Wales

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 16 Dec 2020 as amended on 11 Oct 2022 as amended on 17 Feb 2023 as amended on 10 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are: To relieve people in the UK who are in need, by reason of their age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or social circumstances in such ways as the trustees shall think fit, with particular focus on providing assistance to those affected by Coronavirus (Covid-19) or who are affected by or victim of other disaster, trouble, catastrophe or war.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.