REVOLUTION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the needs of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NAYAN POPAT | Chair | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ketan Shah | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ragin Khimasia | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Krishin Advani | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25 | £25 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £55 | £55 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 204 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2023 | 111 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: • PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO ACCESS EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; • PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT TO BOTH PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES; • PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES AND SOCIAL TRIPS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF A DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 HARTFORD AVENUE
HARROW
HA3 8SY
- Phone:
- 07952437774
- Email:
- info@revolutioncharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window