D.T.H TRINITY ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertake religious activity; pastoral care; after school for the children; assisting children with special needs carried out by volunteers, who also teach the children their mother language, including play activities for children. All this carried out in Leeds 7 district
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 2021: Standard registration
- D.T.H TRINITY ERITEAN ORTHODOX CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY AMANUEL | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUSIE BERHANE | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HENOCK SOLOMON | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MISGINA ABRAHA | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WELDEGABR MAHARI | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
BISRAT SIUM BAYRE | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.41k | £85.96k | £168.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.98k | £42.70k | £45.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 597 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 597 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ERITREAN ORTHODOX TEWAHEDO CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PASTORAL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDUCATION ROAD
LEEDS
LS7 2AL
- Phone:
- 07534260847
- Email:
- marex_ema@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window