THE NETHERTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 516599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We look after the recreation facility at Netherton Cricket Club to enable cricket and other sports to be played there by members and the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE NETHERTON CRICKET GROUND TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Qasim Mughal Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Elaine Taylor Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Ben McNally Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dennis Lewis Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Paul Harris Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 December 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 December 2024 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2022 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 October 2022 707 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Netherton Cricket Club
Highbridge Road
DUDLEY
West Midlands
DY2 0HU
Phone:
01384 861625
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available