LONDON COLNEY HEDGEHOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve the suffering and distress of hedgehogs in need of care by providing a rescue, care and rehabilitation for sick, injured and orphaned hedgehogs with the aim of releasing hedgehogs back into the wild wherever possible and to also provide a safe refuge for non native hedgehog species. Educate the public by promoting awareness of the problems hedgehogs encounter and their future survival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 September 2020: CIO registration
- LCHR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Wilson | Chair | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ro Jackson | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Chant | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.62k | £21.13k | £15.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.50k | £16.89k | £12.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Sep 2020 as amended on 01 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
The objects of the CIO are; 1) For the benefit of the public to further the conservation and preservation of the native hedgehog species in London Colney and near by areas. 2) For the benefit of the public to relieve the suffering and distress of native hedgehogs in need of care and attention by providing a rescue, care and rehabilitation service for sick, injured and orphaned hedgehogs with the aim of releasing such hedgehogs back into the wild wherever possible. 3) To educate the public by promoting awareness of the problems native hedgehogs encounter in relation to their future survival.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONDON COLNEY HEDGEHOG RESCUE
KINGS ROAD
LONDON COLNEY
HERTFORDSHIRE
AL2 1EN
- Phone:
- 07867567464
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window