BURGESS HILL COMMUNITY CUPBOARD CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a membership based food operation providing food to people on low incomes in the Burgess Hill area. A weekly subscription is paid by members and this entitles them to shop for food to a higher value than their subscription.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 August 2020: CIO registration
- BURGESS HILL PANTRY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph James Curwood Foster | Chair | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suneal Ram Kissun | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Cordell | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liz Laybourne | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.07k | £32.85k | £69.39k | £64.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.74k | £27.21k | £37.44k | £60.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.55k | N/A | £10.00k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Aug 2020 as amended on 18 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN BURGESS HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25-29
The Martlets
BURGESS HILL
RH15 9NN
- Phone:
- 08009871156
- Email:
- info@bhlocalpantry.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window