MOSELEY ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 516602
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

the provision of a centre to be used for education and recreational purposes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £104,706
Total expenditure: £104,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BIRMINGHAM CITY COUNCIL Trustee
ERDINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
SAREHOLE MILL RECREATION GROUND (FOSTER FOR BOTANICAL GARDENS ETC)
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
PUBLIC PARK AND PLEASURE GROUND BIRMINGHAM SELLY OAK PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
WILLIAM WALTER HINDE FOR OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
FARM PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 1566 days
GEORGE CADBURY FOR PUBLIC PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
BURBURY PARK
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
PUBLIC PARK AT HARBORNE
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
PUBLIC OPEN SPACE
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
THE ELFORD ESTATE CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
VICTORIA COMMON
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days
KING GEORGE'S FIELD
Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £56.32k £97.93k £79.41k £94.11k £104.71k
Total expenditure £56.32k £97.93k £79.41k £94.11k £104.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 February 2025 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 February 2025 373 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2025 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2025 738 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 November 2024 1024 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 November 2024 1024 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2021 253 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 October 2021 253 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
City Finance
PO Box 16306
BIRMINGHAM
B2 2XR
Phone:
01213030174
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available