Accounts and annual returns WHETSTONE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1191142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required