Financial history SEDGLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 516606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.14k £30.90k £18.46k £27.18k £32.09k
Total expenditure £43.53k £44.82k £18.78k £25.05k £31.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k N/A N/A N/A