PASS IT ON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, PRIMARILY PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS, AND BY WORKING WITH CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR HOMELESSNESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Makinson | Chair | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Elizabeth Cruice | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mahendrasinh Jadeja | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Tyson Martin | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.63k | £38.37k | £23.76k | £19.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £10.55k | £16.22k | £23.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, PRIMARILY PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR AT RISK OF BECOMING HOMELESS, AND BY WORKING WITH CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR HOMELESSNESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Travel News
Unit C Axis Park
Langley
SLOUGH
SL3 8AG
- Phone:
- 07710333824
- Email:
- jon@passitonofficial.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window