DIRT - THE FOUNDATION FOR THE REGENERATION OF EARTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DIRT works toward regenerating soils that have been degraded by conventional agriculture and mining. Dirt's aim is to increase soil fertility, biodiversity, community wellness, water retention and absorption, greenhouse gas sequestration and educate about health land management including bio-dynamic farming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 June 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arizona Waterhouse Muse | Chair | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Siriana Baldini | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINA TANJA MARENZI | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.04k | £114.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.62k | £128.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 JUN 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING THE ENHANCEMENT OF FARMLAND; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ECOLOGY, NATURAL HISTORY, RESOURCE CONSERVATION, SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF THE MORAL OR SPIRITUAL WELFARE OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE COMMUNITY; IN EACH CASE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, INCLUDING: (I) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH INTO BIODYNAMIC FARMING METHODS AND PRACTICES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND (II) IN RELATION TO OBJECT (C) ABOVE, RAISING AWARENESS OF THE TEACHINGS OF DR RUDOLF STEINER INCLUDING THOSE ON BIODYNAMIC FARMING AND THE APPLICATION OF THOSE TEACHINGS IN FARMING AND AGRICULTURE PRACTICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIRT charity
42 Manchester Street
LONDON
W1U 7LW
- Phone:
- 07704766726
- Email:
- hi@dirt.charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window