Trustees OXFORD CULTURAL COLLECTIVE TRUST
Charity number: 1191568

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin John Richard McEwen | Chair | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Piers Zangana | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dipti Patel | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian George | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Holden-White | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Chongo Klenert | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Sunley | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Yuk King Mitchell | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pervin Todiwala | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Butcher | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Sheppardson | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.