SODA FOLK'S GOOD DEEDS CIO

Charity number: 1194310
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Aims to advance citizenship and community development by raising awareness of and promoting charitable activities. The amounts of the grants awarded are likely to be up to a maximum of £200 per award and the purpose behind such grants is to further advance the charitable activities which the recipient has been has been undertaking as well as to encourage others to engage with such activities

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 2021: CIO registration
  • 02 January 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 02 January 2025: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 739 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 739 days
Submit annual return Open in new window