COMPASSIONATE PAWS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Compassionate Paws International provides veterinary care to street animals, in partnership with local people and/or organisations, in regions of the world where there is a low level of resources. Activities: - Sterilisation - Emergency veterinary care - Animal welfare education & advocacy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 26 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Charles Alexander Duffin BVSc MRCVS | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAJ RAJPUT | Trustee | 07 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Dobinson BVSc MRCVS | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sea Monique Ramanat | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Morris | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Marie Malia | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.10k | £15.75k | £20.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.53k | £17.59k | £15.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE • THE PROMOTION OF KINDNESS AND THE PREVENTION OR SUPPRESSION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS THROUGH EDUCATION AND ADVOCACY. • THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY CARE AND TREATMENT • THE CARE AND RE-HOMING OF ANIMALS THAT ARE ABANDONED, MISTREATED OR LOST • FERAL ANIMAL CONTROL THROUGH STERILISATION AND ANIMAL BIRTH CONTROL (ABC) ANIMALS MAY INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO DOGS, CATS, HORSES, DONKEYS, GOATS & CHICKENS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Martello Gardens
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE7 7LE
- Phone:
- 07821613388
- Email:
- hello@compassionatepaws.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window