THE UK FRIENDS OF SUMBANDILA SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sumbandila aims to find intelligent and determined children from extremely deprived rural backgrounds and take them on an eight-year educational journey, with the long-term goal of creating leaders and entrepreneurs who can effect much-needed change in our society and economy. Sumbandila places a high emphasis on much-needed skills like mathematics, science, and technology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 August 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEIGH BRISTOW | Chair | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Vernetti | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antoinette Vanderpuije | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Richard Hoernle | Trustee | 08 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £44.93k | £88.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £402 | £45.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 January 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME ON TRUST TO APPLY THEM IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND, IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING), THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN RESPECT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTHERN AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marwyn Investment Management Ltd
11 Buckingham Street
LONDON
WC2N 6DF
- Phone:
- 0155160251
- Email:
- lbristow@sumbandila.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window