Trustees NATIONAL DEBATE TEAM
Charity number: 1191456

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Stephen Jasper | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Newman | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Sewell Fidderman | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Dominic Tarnoy Collier | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
The English-Speaking Union of the Commonwealth | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Phillip O'Reilly | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Robinson | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Noel Fitch | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.