Accounts and annual returns INSTATE

Charity Number: 1191948
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2022 14 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 14 February 2023 8 days late