Accounts and annual returns KITE COLLEGE

Charity number: 1193244
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 04 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 July 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 July 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 22 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window