THE HANBURY TOWER AND BELLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain the equipment used in the church to ring the bells eg new ropes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 July 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neville Sheldrick | Trustee | 03 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen C Townsend | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Holbeche | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stewart William Holbeche | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alan Blake | Trustee | 22 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER WALTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALMA GRAZEBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £871 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £210 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9 | £1.08k | £40 | £100 | £20 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MAY 1985
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE REPAIR, RENEWAL, REPLACEMENT, IMPROVING AND AUGMENTATION OF THE FABRIC FITTINGS AND FURNISHINGS OF THE TOWER OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN HANBURY IN THE DIOCESE OF WORCESTER AND OF THE BELLS, BELL FRAME, BELL FITTINGS, BELL ROPES, AND SOUND CONTROL APPRATUS AS FROM TIME TO TIME INSTALLED IN THE TOWER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Chesterton Close
Redditch
B97 5XS
- Phone:
- 01527540577
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window