HUMANITY IN NEED

Charity number: 1192467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY THE SUPPLY OF ACCOMODATION, FOOD, COTHING AND MEDICAL AID. HELPING HOMELESS PERSONS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUCH INDIVIDUALS OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,240
Total expenditure: £25,362

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Bangladesh
  • India
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wajahat Baloch FCA, FCCA Chair 09 August 2020
None on record
Farah Farooq Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
MUHAMMAD QAMMAR KHAN Trustee 23 August 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.70k £32.78k £24.24k
Total expenditure £18.12k £22.93k £25.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
REDBIRD ACCOUNTANTS
72 EVINGTON ROAD
LEICESTER
72 EVINGTON ROAD
LE2 1HH
Phone:
01163669980