Accounts and annual returns THE PEDMORE TECHNOLOGY COLLEGE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 516644
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 24 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 15 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 15 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 30 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required