THE OPEN MINDS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public including children and young people in the lives of black people in particular but not exclusively by the provision of workshops, seminars, meetings, school programmes, reading groups and library facilities and in such other ways as the trustees see fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £1,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arienrhi Grace Toby | Chair | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka O'Sullivan | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Opeyemi Alabi-Hundeyin | Trustee | 11 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adaeze Obasuyi | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Agbota Eronmosele Okojie | Trustee | 22 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62k | £6.74k | £8.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £7.31k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £5.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 November 2021 | 01 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 November 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LIVES OF BLACK PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS, MEETINGS, SCHOOL PROGRAMMES, READING GROUPS AND LIBRARY FACILITIES AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Laughton Road
BRIGHTON
BN2 6QF
- Phone:
- 01273982086
- Email:
- admin@openminds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window