VOICES FOR LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voices for Life is a registered charity to help inspire children to be happy and confident through the provision of high-quality specialised singing and confidence coaching programmes for primary schools. Through the powerful interplay of music and confidence and emotion coaching techniques, the programmes will enable children to build their emotional wellbeing, confidence and self-esteem.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Martin | Chair | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elean Louisa Yvette Oldfield | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Hale | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Faye Bird | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lee Goucher | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY EDWARDS | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.61k | £64.64k | £135.75k | £154.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £49.58k | £67.93k | £107.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 12 LIVING IN THE UK BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING MUSICAL EDUCATION PROGRAMMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
12a Eastrip Lane
Colerne
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 8AX
- Phone:
- 07989343195
- Email:
- tessa@voicesforlife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window