THE SLEAFORD METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1190906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing a pre-school setting for children to play and learn in a safe, caring environment, promoting parental involvement in their child's education, supporting those parents in need of assistance and guidance with their child's educational needs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £118,808
Total expenditure: £119,178

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2020: CIO registration
  • 15 August 2022: Funds received from 1155287 SLEAFORD METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SLEAFORD METHODIST PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Coulan Chair 08 March 2022
None on record
SUSAN ELIZABETH RICHARDSON Trustee 12 November 2024
None on record
ZOE WILLS Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Rev GABRIELE ELISABETH BRITTON-VOSS BA HONS Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
Emma Louise Metheringham Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
HILARY KATHLEEN HARRISON Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Lesley Molly Betts Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
LAURA JANE METHERINGHAM Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
JOHN EDWARD EAMES Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record
Christopher John Clark Trustee 05 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £150.83k £112.84k £118.81k
Total expenditure £0 £107.23k £121.28k £119.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £104.47k £103.73k £104.83k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 06 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HALL
CHURCH LANE
SLEAFORD
NG34 7DF
Phone:
07885301827
Website:

No information available