THE GLOBAL ACCESS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and protection of public health in particular, but not exclusively, in low and middle income countries in such ways as the trustees think fit, including by the development and provision of medical technologies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Malaysia
- Pakistan
- Senegal
Governance
- 16 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Davis | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN LOW AND MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES AND AMONGST ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVISION OF MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES; AND (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEDFORD TECHNOLOGY PARK
THURLEIGH
BEDFORD
MK44 2YA
- Phone:
- 07907803258
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window