WEST PECKHAM VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a village hall for sports and recreation to benefit the local area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £330 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 24 August 2020: CIO registration
- 29 October 2021: Funds received from 226622 WEST PECKHAM VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew John Edwards | Chair | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Pembroke | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Mundy Wright | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anne Pearce | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Johnson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Drummond Taylor | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Amy Reading | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Simpson | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.99k | £7.89k | £11.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £9.11k | £10.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £330 | N/A | £330 | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO OWN AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WEST PECKHAM AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DIABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIVE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST PECKHAM VILLAGE HALL
CHURCH ROAD
WEST PECKHAM
MAIDSTONE
ME18 5JJ
- Phone:
- 01622813585
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window