BOSNIAN GENOCIDE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to humanise history through collection and preservation of survivor testimonies, personal objects and education about the Bosnian genocide by providing speakers, educational material, activity resources and much more, we hope to challenge perceptions of social justice, morality and human rights here in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2020: CIO registration
- 03 April 2023: Funds received from 1092006 BOSNIA AND HERZEGOVINA CLUB LJILJAN NORTH EAST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Smajo Beso | Chair | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CARLTON | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
HAKIJA STITKOVAC | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIAUW-JUNG LIE | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £150 | £37.83k | £250 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £4.01k | £4.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £34.80k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF THE BOSNIAN GENOCIDE. IN PARTICULAR, EUROPEAN, BOSNIAN AND BRITISH BOSNIAN HISTORY RELEVANT TO THE BOSNIAN GENOCIDE. FURTHERMORE, ADVANCEMENT OF THE SUBJECT IN RELATION TO OTHER GENOCIDES AND THE HOLOCAUST. TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY, EQUALITY, DIVERSITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION ABOUT THE BOSNIAN GENOCIDE AND ITS CONTEMPORARY RELEVANCE. TO PROMOTE THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, RELIGION, DISABILITY, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF PREJUDICE AND RACISM IN SOCIETY INCLUDING THE SIGNIFICANT IMPACT OF THE BOSNIAN GENOCIDE, AS WELL AS OTHER ACTS OF SYSTEMATIC DISCRIMINATION, IN PARTICULAR THOSE LEADING TO GENOCIDE AND THE HOLOCAUST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 CRAGSIDE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE7 7EJ
- Phone:
- 07809413465
- Email:
- info@bget-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window