Springfield Domestic Abuse Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in South Cumbria, we have a highly skilled and dedicated team who provide a range of services and tailored support to clients who are affected by all types domestic abuse. This is through either the community hub or our refuge accommodation, specifically for women who are potentially homeless because they are a high risk victim of domestic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £55,525 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 October 2020: CIO registration
- 12 December 2023: Funds received from 231434 SPRINGFIELD DOMESTIC ABUSE SUPPORT IN SOUTH LAKELA...
- SPRINGFIELD (Working name)
- SPRINGFIELD DOMESTIC ABUSE SUPPORT IN SOUTH LAKELAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WILKINSON | Chair | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Ann Roberson | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Riley | Trustee | 05 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Slater | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marjory Tomlinson | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.10k | £581.70k | £449.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.20k | £258.73k | £458.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £27.88k | £72.80k | £55.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £231.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £58.32k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £290.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £171.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £86.77k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Oct 2020 as amended on 23 Aug 2023 as amended on 14 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC ABUSE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH HOUSING, ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND/OR SUPPORT TO HELP THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR ABILITY TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY, TO REBUILD THEIR LIVES AND TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. 2. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS WHO SUFFER FROM, OR ARE AFFECTED BY, DOMESTIC ABUSE IN ALL ITS FORMS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND TRAINING ON, AND RAISING AWARENESS OF, DOMESTIC ABUSE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stricklandgate House
92 Stricklandgate
Kendal
LA9 4PU
- Phone:
- 01539726171
- Email:
- admin@springfieldsupport.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window