THE FRIENDS OF PERSHORE ABBEY CIO

Charity number: 1193273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the CIO are the preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration and improvement of the fabric of Pershore Abbey at Pershore, Worcestershire including its furniture, ornaments and contents for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £72,892
Total expenditure: £108,492

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2021: CIO registration
  • 10 August 2021: Funds received from 500710 FRIENDS OF PERSHORE ABBEY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael James Hodges Chair 20 September 2020
None on record
Martin Fowler Trustee 07 May 2024
None on record
Patricia Ann Steel Trustee 12 September 2021
None on record
ROBIN WHITTAKER Trustee 12 September 2021
THE FRIENDS OF COLERIDGE
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time
WORCESTERSHIRE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Sarah Jane Ingles Trustee 12 September 2021
None on record
ERICA MAY NORTON Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
MARGARET METCALFE GOODRICH Trustee 20 September 2020
WORCESTERSHIRE HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr JUDITH MARY DALE Trustee 20 September 2020
FRIENDS OF PERSHORE HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF THE ABBEY CHURCH OF THE HOLY CROSS PERSHORE
Received: On time
Martyn Edgar Spence Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Peter Charles Dann Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Rev Claire Ann Lording Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £121.88k £66.55k £72.89k
Total expenditure £57.07k £393.61k £108.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 13 March 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 13 March 2024 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 High Street
Pershore
Worcestershire
WR10 1DP
Phone:
07809742733
Website:

WWW.FOPA.ORG.UK