LEVENS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a village hall for the benefit of the local community, giving residents somewhere to meet and undertake a range of leisure activities. Examples of activities include: brownies; dancing/music groups; local history society, toddlers' group, charity coffee mornings, film nights, yoga classes, painting classes, young children's activities, philatelic society and local/general elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 30 December 2020: CIO registration
- 10 January 2022: Funds received from 223443 THE LEVENS INSTITUTE
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Sanders | Chair | 30 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Adam Mark Hearnden | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Ian Rogerson | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Beard | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Riley | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robyn Elise Atkinson | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Hazel Mason | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Riley | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Miller | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Watson | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Golding Miller | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Connor | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ROBERT WOOD | Trustee | 30 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.52k | £8.98k | £11.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.49k | £6.29k | £7.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LEVENS ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEVENS INSTITUTE
LEVENS
KENDAL
LA8 8NL
- Phone:
- 015395 60334
- Email:
- the.institute@levens.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window