WOMEN IN ACADEMIA SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1192281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The network aims to provide a safer space for all women in academia at every level to support each other, to build networks and to share knowledge, in order to enable women to better navigate academia, and to support women in their various roles inside and outside the academy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,696
Total expenditure: £684

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Netherlands Antilles
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WIASN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Amy Bonsall-Redston Chair 12 February 2020
None on record
Dr Jennifer Leigh Trustee 09 February 2024
None on record
Dr Pamela Mei Na YEOW Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
PROFESSOR ELEONORA BELFIORE Trustee 20 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £985 £9.35k £7.70k
Total expenditure £985 £9.25k £684
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 December 2022 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
23 Park Road West
CHESTER
CH4 8BQ
Phone:
07989600650