Bear Flat Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bear Flat Environment operates in the Bear Flat area of Bath for the benefit of residents, businesses and visitors, in conjunction with the local residents' association. We promote and support improvements to the local environment, including local amenities, historic character and the natural environment through the raising of funds through grants, etc and contracting work as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 19 May 2021: CIO registration
- BFE (Working name)
- BEAR FLAT ENVIRONMENT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Morgan | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Scamell | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James William Gibbons | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Charles Trenchard | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Catherine Kingaby | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Cantell | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Eyre Somerset | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Richardson | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £399 | £14.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219 | £4.97k | £10.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 19 MAY 2021 AMENDED TO CIO ASSOCIATION 05 FEB 2024 as amended on 06 Feb 2024 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BEAR FLAT, BATH:- A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST, EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, DESIGN AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT C) TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE HISTORIC CHARACTER OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA D) TO SECURE THE DEVELOPMENT, RETENTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF LOCAL GREEN ENVIRONMENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT E) TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SPORTS AND RECREATION FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BEAR FLAT, BATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 BLOOMFIELD AVENUE
BATH
BA2 3AD
- Phone:
- 07964085614
- Email:
- garethsomerset@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window