D-ECON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Farwa Sial | Chair | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARIANE AGUNSOYE | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Danielle Guizzo | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hanna Szymborska | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ingrid Kvangraven | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carolina Alves | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE PLURALITY OF APPROACHES TO ECONOMICS AS A DISCIPLINE, WITH A VIEW TO MAKING THE SUBJECT MORE INCLUSIVE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) RUNNING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS AND WORKSHOPS, B) CONDUCTING, COMMISSIONING AND SUPPORTING ACADEMIC RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC, C) AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION TO STUDENTS OF THE DISCIPLINE OF ECONOMICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Stoke Newington
Church Street
LONDON
Choose One...
N16 0AS
- Phone:
- 07789818193
- Email:
- info@d-econ.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window