Trustees PETERSFIELD CLIMATE ACTION NETWORK (PECAN)

Charity number: 1192778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gregory Ford Chair 09 December 2020
None on record
Robert Staples Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Paul Parkin Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Richard Anthony Robinson Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
ANDREW LEE Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Gethin Morgan-Owen Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Rachel Ritchie Trustee 19 October 2023
None on record
Melanie Claire Oxley Trustee 08 February 2023
FRIENDS OF PETERSFIELD PHYSIC GARDEN
Received: On time
ELIZABETH BISSET Trustee 09 December 2020
PETERSFIELD WOMENS INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Jocelyn Louise Bevan Trustee 09 December 2020
None on record