NORFOLK SHEDS NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Norfolk Sheds Network supports, promotes and enables the establishment of Men's Sheds across the county of Norfolk, providing advice and expertise to enable the development of both existing and new Men's Sheds in communities across Norfolk, and facilitating communication and engagement between the Men's Sheds in the form of a county network.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN NORFOLK BY PROMOTING AND ENABLING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF NEW MEN'S SHEDS CHARITIES AND FACILITATING INFORMATION SHARING, COMMUNICATION AND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN MEN’S SHEDS CHARITIES IN THE FORM OF A COUNTY MEMBERSHIP NETWORK.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window