HECTOR'S HOUSE CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities consist of rescuing, rehabilitating and rehoming stray cats in the area of Torbay and surrounding areas in Devon. Additionally, we respond to reports of lost/found cats and help reunite them with their owners wherever possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 13 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zara Oldfield | Chair | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Rowe | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Short | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Appleby | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Oldfield | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kitty Oldfield | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.95k | £176.43k | £324.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.85k | £159.65k | £153.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS IN THE BOROUGH OF TORBAY BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, REHOMING SUCH CATS WHERE POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Audley Avenue
TORQUAY
TQ2 7PB
- Phone:
- 07369206984
- Email:
- hectorshouse2020@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window