Trustees HECTOR'S HOUSE CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1192317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zara Oldfield Chair 15 November 2020
None on record
Elaine Rowe Trustee 30 August 2024
None on record
Alison Short Trustee 06 November 2021
None on record
Clive Appleby Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Edward Oldfield Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Kitty Oldfield Trustee 15 November 2020
None on record