THE SION MULLANE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation provides grants to schools and other institutions in Wales who organise social and physical activities for students. Such grants would be provided where students come from underprivileged families and backgrounds and cannot afford participating in social and physical activities because they require financing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 22 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Owen Davies | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Mullane | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Nathan Gourlay | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ffion Siobhan Mullane | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Cuff | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Rhys Patchell | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Lipetz-Robic | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.85k | £22.16k | £13.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09k | £14.19k | £9.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS OLD IN WALES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO STUDENTS AND MENTORING AND COACHING TO STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77-79 Blythe Road
London
W14 0HP
- Phone:
- 07717530460
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window