EAST GOSCOTE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 516701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide a village hall for use by residents and surrounding villages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £9,034
Total expenditure: £13,060

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 August 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EAST GOSCOTE PARISH COUNCIL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £15.22k £24.31k £25.91k £20.03k £9.03k
Total expenditure £13.38k £12.93k £14.98k £17.85k £13.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £14.84k £10.67k £500 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 18 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VILLAGE HALL
LONG FURROW
EAST GOSCOTE
LEICS
LE7 3ZL
Phone:
01162602202
Website:

No information available