MELBOURNE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sick, elderly or disabled persons resident in Melbourne and nearby villages by providing or assisting in the provision of services calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 29 September 2020: CIO registration
- 27 September 2021: Funds received from 516064 MELBOURNE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CARE GROUP
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN STANLEY DOLLAMORE | Chair | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Alison Thornhill | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Long | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Mary Lott | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Dobby | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dunster Carroll | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Freeman | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Corbett | Trustee | 30 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.89k | £40.64k | £24.07k | £31.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £26.04k | £26.71k | £32.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED PERSONS RESIDENT IN MELBOURNE AND NEARBY VILLAGES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Melbourne Community Care
Unit D
Williams Yard
Melbourne
DE73 8JR
- Phone:
- 01332863585
- Email:
- Melbourne-care@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window