THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CATHERINE WITH ST PAUL NEASDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Church of England church serving the parish of Neasden in the London Borough of Brent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
48 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brent
Governance
- 26 August 2020: Standard registration
- ST CATHERINE'S NEASDEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ANTHEA CARMICHAEL | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bai Bai Conteh | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Rose | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eric Rose | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Leroy Payne | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bobby Thomas | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mabel Gladys Doku | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Midwinter | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Stanislas | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.40k | £73.89k | £63.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.09k | £146.52k | £61.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 March 2024 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2023 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 March 2023 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CATHERINE'S CHURCH
Dollis Hill Lane
LONDON
NW10 1QB
- Phone:
- 02084527322
- Email:
- stcatherines@gmx.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window