CORNERSTONE CHURCH GRAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sadly the COVID-19 pandemic struck in early 2020. This inevitably impacted upon the timescale in which we could achieve our initial objectives of establishing the church. We met as a church during lockdowns over Zoom and encouraged the church family to serve each other and their neighbours in what ways they could in a safe and appropriate manner. Legal requirements and policies where also done.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 27 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Roy Walton | Chair | 27 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Marius Schultz | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Brock | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Francis Newman | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paula Ann Newman | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie John Brock | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Elizabeth Kelly | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.10k | £39.96k | £41.08k | £44.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.23k | £29.98k | £34.47k | £41.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ATTACHED STATEMENT OF FAITH, PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN GRAYS, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 3.1.2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE RULES AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 BUTTELL CLOSE
GRAYS
RM17 6UN
- Phone:
- 07942673645
- Email:
- info@cornerstonegrays.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window