Accounts and annual returns MORE TO HER LIFE

Charity Number: 1191910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 04 February 2025 249 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 February 2025 249 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window