DARUSSALAM EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Five time daily prayers Friday cermon Ramadan festival 2 eid festival Educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 03 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Javid Iqbal | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD QASIM RIZVI | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL RAUF ABDUL SATTAR MITHAGARE | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL QADIR | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.68k | £138.58k | £127.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.07k | £93.48k | £94.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.34k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 March 2024 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF HOLY QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM) IN THE BLACKBURN AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DARUSSALAM
184 WHALLEY NEW ROAD
BLACKBURN
BB1 9TN
- Phone:
- 01254582087
- Email:
- farroukh@zaheerandco.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window